Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904471

EP0904471 - SEWERAGE INLET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valperz, Anke
Am Fehlberg 1
51580 Reichsdorf / DE
For all designated states
Valperz, Antonius
Am Fehlberg 1
51580 Reichshof / DE
[1999/13]
Inventor(s)01 / LANGENBERG, Hartwig
Herweg 80
51702 Bergneustadt / DE
02 / VALPERZ, Antonius
Am Fehlberg 1
51580 Reichshof / DE
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Freischem, Werner
Patentanwälte Freischem
Salierring 47-53
50677 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Freischem, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Freischem, An Gross St. Martin 2
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97927168.111.06.1997
[1999/13]
WO1997EP03025
Priority number, dateDE199612386914.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19623869
[1999/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9747829
Date:18.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0904471
Date:31.03.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997
[1999/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904471
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:E03F5/04, E03F5/16
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/13]
TitleGerman:SCHMUTZWASSEREINLAUF[1999/13]
English:SEWERAGE INLET[1999/13]
French:ELEMENT D'ADMISSION D'EAU USEE[1999/13]
Entry into regional phase14.11.1998National basic fee paid 
14.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/13]
04.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2002Fee for grant paid
09.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199903   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.09.2002
FR18.09.2002
GB18.09.2002
IE18.09.2002
IT18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT11.06.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]FI18.09.2002
FR18.09.2002
GB18.09.2002
IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT11.06.2003
Former [2006/14]FI18.09.2002
FR18.09.2002
GB18.09.2002
IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT11.06.2003
Former [2005/21]FI18.09.2002
GB18.09.2002
IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT11.06.2003
Former [2005/11]GB18.09.2002
IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
AT11.06.2003
Former [2004/21]GB18.09.2002
IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/42]IE18.09.2002
NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/22]NL18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE9311176U  (EICHELMANN HORST [DE]) [AD] 1,3,6,9,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3620182  (KESSEL BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1,2,7,8,13-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]AT366128B  (HUTTERER & LECHNER KG [AT])