Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0906082

EP0906082 - DETERGENT COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/14]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DECOSTER, Sandrine
107, avenue d'Enghien
F-93800 Epinay sur Seine / FR
[1999/14]
Representative(s)Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise , et al
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/14]Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise , et al
L'OREAL, Centre de Recherche Charles Zviak, Département Propriété Industrielle, 90, rue du Général Roguet
92583 Clichy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date97927252.306.06.1997
[1999/14]
WO1997FR01008
Priority number, dateFR1996000719307.06.1996         Original published format: FR 9607193
[1999/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9746211
Date:11.12.1997
Language:FR
[1998/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0906082
Date:07.04.1999
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997
[1999/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0906082
Date:25.04.2001
Language:FR
[2001/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06, A61K7/50
[1999/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/14]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[1999/14]
English:DETERGENT COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS AND USE[1999/14]
French:COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES DETERGENTES ET UTILISATION[1999/14]
Entry into regional phase07.01.1999National basic fee paid 
07.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/14]
11.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.02.2001Fee for grant paid
26.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)26.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.04.2001
ES30.10.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2004/04]ES30.10.2001
Cited inInternational searchJPS63307811  [ ] (KANEBO LTD, et al)
 [X]  - H.MINAMINO, A.HARASHIMA, "Shampoo compositions containing anionic surfactants, amino-modified organopolysiloxanes and amphoteric surfactants", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890918), vol. 111, no. 12, Database accession no. 102511, XP002026447 [X] 1,2,16,18,19 * abstract *