Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0954286

EP0954286 - LIPOSOMAL INFLUENZA VACCINE COMPOSITION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, IT, LU
published on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM
46 Jabotinsky Street
91042 Jerusalem / IL
[2008/28]
Former [1999/45]For all designated states
YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM
36 Jabotinsky Street
Jerusalem 91042 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / KEDAR, Eliezer
Kadish Luse Street 24/7
96920 Jerusalem / IL
02 / BABAI, Ilan
Frankfurter Street 9
49612 Petach Tikva / IL
03 / BARENHOLZ, Yechezkel
Nave Shanan Street 18
93707 Jerusalem / IL
[1999/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/45]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97927355.424.06.1997
[1999/45]
WO1997IL00210
Priority number, dateUS19960020063P24.06.1996         Original published format: US 20063 P
[1999/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9749423
Date:31.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/57]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0954286
Date:10.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997
[1999/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0954286
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/127, A61K39/145, A61K38/19
[1999/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/45]
Extension statesAL22.01.1999
LT22.01.1999
LV22.01.1999
RO22.01.1999
SI22.01.1999
TitleGerman:LIPOSOMALER GRIPPEIMPFSTOFF UND VERFAHREN[2008/22]
English:LIPOSOMAL INFLUENZA VACCINE COMPOSITION AND METHOD[1999/45]
French:COMPOSITION LIPOSOMALE DE VACCIN CONTRE LA GRIPPE ET UTILISATION[2008/22]
Former [1999/45]LIPOSOMALER GRIPPEIMMPFSTOFF UND VERFAHREN
Former [1999/45]COMPOSITION DE VACCIN CONTRE LA GRIPPE ENCAPSULEE DANS DES LIPOSOMES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION
Entry into regional phase22.01.1999National basic fee paid 
22.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/45]
16.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2008Fee for grant paid
05.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Request for further processing for:08.04.2004Request for further processing filed
08.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE24.06.2009
LU24.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IE24.06.2009
CH30.06.2009
FR30.06.2009
LI30.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/07]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/05]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0626169  (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,13-16 * page 5, line 44 - line 54; claims 19-22 * [Y] 1-20;
 [XY]EP0356339  (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,13-16 * page 3, line 64 - page 4, line 9; claims 19,20 * * page 4, line 44 - line 52 * [Y] 1-20;
 [A]WO9527508  (MINI FOR AGRICULTURE FOR THE S [AU], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9504524  (OPPERBAS HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 3; claims 14,15,21 *
 [XY]  - MBAWUIKE, INNOCENT N. ET AL, "Enhancement of the protective efficacy of inactivated influenza A virus vaccine in aged mice by IL-2 liposomes", VACCINE (1990), 8(4), 347-52 CODEN: VACCDE;ISSN: 0264-410X, (1990), XP000140552 [X] 1-6,9,13-16 * page 348, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * [Y] 1-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(90)90093-2
by applicantUS4426330
 US4534899
 US4235871
 US5013556
 EP0356339
 EP0626169
    - ADLER, A. ET AL., CANCER BIOTHERAPY, (1995), vol. 10, pages 293 - 306,
    - ARNON, R.; HORWITZ, R.J., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 4, pages 449 - 453,
    - ARNON, R.; VAN REGENMORTEL, M.H.V., FASEB J., (1992), vol. 6, pages 3265 - 3274,
    - BEN-AHMEIDA, E.T.S. ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 217 - 231,
    - BOTH, G.W. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1983), vol. 48, pages 52 - 60,
    - ENGELHARD, D., BONE MARROW TRANSP., (1993), vol. 11, pages 1 - 5,
    - GAZIT, E., CANCERLMMNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1994), vol. 38, pages 243 - 52,
    - GILLIS, S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1978), vol. 120, pages 2027 - 2031,
    - ANTIBODIES: A LABORATORY MANUAL, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, page 99,
    - KEDAR, I. ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHERAPY, (1994), vol. 16, pages 47 - 59,
    - MINAMIDE, L.S.; BAMBURG, J.R., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 190, pages 66 - 70,
    - MOSSMANN, T., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1983), vol. 65, pages 55 - 63,
    - POTTER, C.W., BASIC AND APPLIED INFLUENZA RESEARCH, CRC PRESS INC., pages 119 - 204,
    - SHAPIRA-NAHOR, 0.; ZAKAY-RONES, Z., J. MED. VIROL., (1985), vol. 15, pages 81 - 89,
    - SZOKA, F., JR. ET AL., ANN. RE. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467,
    - MBAWUIKE ET AL., VACCINE, (199008), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 347 - 52,