Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010222

EP1010222 - TRUCK-MOUNTED BREAKERS INTENDED FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE LINES AND A METHOD IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/25]TRUCK-MOUNTED BREAKERS INTENDED FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE LINES AND A METHOD IN CONNECTION TO SUCH LINES
[2001/40]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västerås / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SKÖLD, Leif
Notgardsvägen 20
S-771 41 Ludvika / SE
02 / LINDER, Torbjörn
Facktorpsvägen 13
S-772 70 Saxdalen / SE
03 / CARLSSON, Jan
Engelbrektsgatan 23
S-771 30 Ludvika / SE
04 / SÖLVER, Carl-Ejnar
Päronstigen 15
S-771 43 Ludvika / SE
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB
Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date97927578.112.06.1997
[2000/25]
WO1997SE01038
Priority number, dateSE1996000233513.06.1996         Original published format: SE 9602335
[2000/25]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9748157
Date:18.12.1997
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010222
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:H02B11/167
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:SCHALTERWAGEN FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGSLEITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN VERWENDBAR MIT SOLCHEN LEITUNGEN[2001/40]
English:TRUCK-MOUNTED BREAKERS INTENDED FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE LINES AND A METHOD IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH LINES[2001/40]
French:DISJONCTEURS SUR CHARIOT POUR LIGNES DE HAUTE TENSION ET PROCEDE ADAPTE A DES TELLES LIGNES[2000/25]
Former [2000/25]SCHALTERWAGENS FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGSLEITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN, VERWENDBAR ZU SOLCHEN LEITUNGEN
Former [2000/25]TRUCK-MOUNTED BREAKERS INTENDED FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE LINES AND A METHOD IN CONNECTION TO SUCH LINES
Entry into regional phase18.12.1997Translation filed 
13.01.1999National basic fee paid 
13.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/25]
06.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
11.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1415613  (CONCORDIA SPRECHER SCHALT);
 [A]US2128149  (LINDE LEONARD J);
 [A]US1929293  (JACQUES SAINT-GERMAIN)