Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0900445

EP0900445 - THERMALLY FUSED RESISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SPECTROL ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
4051 Greystone Drive Ontario
California 91761 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For all designated states
SPECTROL ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
4051 Greystone Drive
Ontario, California 91761 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RILEY, Richard, E.
1163 Atwater Avenue
Riverside, CA 92506 / US
[1999/10]
Representative(s)Holmes, Matthew Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester, M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Holmes, Matthew Peter , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date97927685.421.05.1997
[1999/10]
WO1997US08599
Priority number, dateUS1996065183321.05.1996         Original published format: US 651833
[1999/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9744801
Date:27.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0900445
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997
[1999/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H37/76, H01H85/048
[2000/39]
Former International [1999/10]H01H37/76
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/10]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURABHÄNGIGER SCHMELZWIDERSTAND[1999/10]
English:THERMALLY FUSED RESISTOR[1999/10]
French:RESISTANCE THERMO-FUSIONNEE[1999/10]
Entry into regional phase24.11.1998National basic fee paid 
24.11.1998Search fee paid 
24.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/10]
01.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE9402484U  (DEWITRON ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0517306  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-17 * column 6, line 29 - column 8, line 2; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US5192940  (YAJIMA KIYOSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column A *
International search[A]US4494104  (HOLMES EDWARD S B [CA])