EP0914088 - POWDERED COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SILICONE ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1999/19] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBKOWSKI, Brian, John 31 Wakeley Street Shelton, CT 06484 / US | 02 /
ZNAIDEN, Alexander, Paul 110 Fox Road Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | 03 /
CHENEY, Michael, Charles 383 Sigwin Drive Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Rots, Maria Johanna Francisca Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Rots, Maria Johanna Francisca Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97928184.7 | 10.06.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997EP03063 | Priority number, date | US19960020748P | 28.06.1996 Original published format: US 20748 P | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800104 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914088 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914088 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/035 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
A61K8/895 (EP,US);
A61K8/022 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/368 (EP,US);
A61Q1/12 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE PUDERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND SILIKONELASTOMERE | [1999/19] | English: | POWDERED COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SILICONE ELASTOMERS | [1999/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES EN POUDRE CONTENANT DES ELASTOMERES DE SILICONE | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.09.2002 | IT | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | NL | 11.09.2002 | SE | 11.12.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2003/31] | CH | 11.09.2002 | |
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
NL | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | NL | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 11.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH049323 ; | JPH03197413 [ ] (KOBAYASHI KOSE CO [JP]); | JPH02304015 [ ] (POLA CHEM IND INC); | [A]FR2688134 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0709083 (REVLON CONSUMER PROD CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9525499 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0388582 (KOBAYASHI KOSE CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 16, no. 156, Database accession no. (C - 930), & JP04009323 A 00000000 (KOBAYASHI KOSE) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - STN, File Supplier, Karlsruhe, DE, File, XP002039716 [A] 1-5 * Chemical Abstracts, vol 115, AN=286965 see the abstract * | [A] - STN, File Supplier, Karlsruhe, DE, File, XP002039717 [A] 1-5 * Chemical Abstracts, vol 115, AN=15313 see the abstract * |