Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001896

EP1001896 - MAGNETIC DEBRIS SEPARATOR IN A BRAKE HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.08.2002  [2002/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asko Taipale Oy
Hermiankatu 14
33720 Tampere / FI
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / TAIPALE, Asko
Haavikontie 11
FIN-33800 Tampere / FI
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Kangasmäki, Reijo Holger
Finnish Patent Consulting FPC
Patenttikonsultointi Kangasmäki Oy
Enqvistinkatu 7A
33400 Tampere / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Kangasmäki, Reijo Holger
Finnish Patent Consulting FPC, Hermiankatu 14
33720 Tampere / FI
Application number, filing date97928296.901.07.1997
[2000/21]
WO1997FI00420
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901325
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001896
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/00, F16D66/00, // B03C1:30
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:MAGNETISCHER ABSCHEIDER VON ABRIEBPARTIKELN IN EINEM BREMSGEHÄUSE[2000/21]
English:MAGNETIC DEBRIS SEPARATOR IN A BRAKE HOUSING[2000/21]
French:SEPARATEUR MAGNETIQUE DE DEBRIS DANS UN CARTER DE FREIN[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1999Translation filed 
28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/33]
07.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.03.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
17.03.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.03.2000M01   Fee paid on   23.03.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2000
31.07.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3148032  (MAGNETFAB BONN GMBH [DE]);
 [Y]DE4021567  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]);
 [A]US4376474  (TUNNELL JAMES H, et al)