Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0939766

EP0939766 - SYNTHESIS OF SOLUBLE BETA-SHEET FORMING PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA
Morrill Hall
100 Church Street Southeast
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]For all designated states
REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA
Morrill Hall, 100 Church Street Southeast
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GRAY, Beulah, H.
1744 Colvin Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55116 / US
02 / HASEMAN, Judith, R.
1329 Ches Mar Lane
Eagan, MN 55123 / US
03 / MAYO, Kevin
13800 Crowne Hill Lane
Minnetonka, MN 55305 / US
04 / GRIFFIOEN, Arjan, W., Tumor Angiogenesis Lab.
Uni. Hospital Maastricht, P. Debyelaan 25
NL-6202 AZ Maastricht / NL
[1999/36]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/36]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97928665.523.05.1997
[1999/36]
WO1997US08944
Priority number, dateUS1996065363224.05.1996         Original published format: US 653632
US1996067148727.06.1996         Original published format: US 671487
[1999/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9744354
Date:27.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0939766
Date:08.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997
[1999/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/00, C07K1/00, A61K38/16, C07K14/52
[1999/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/36]
TitleGerman:SYNTHESE VON LÖSLICHEN BETA-SHEET BILDENDEN PEPTIDEN[1999/36]
English:SYNTHESIS OF SOLUBLE BETA-SHEET FORMING PEPTIDES[1999/36]
French:SYNTHESE DE PEPTIDES FORMANT DES FEUILLETS BETA SOLUBLES[1999/36]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1998National basic fee paid 
23.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/36]
03.04.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/28]
25.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/28]
Request for further processing for:25.07.2005Request for further processing filed
25.07.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.08.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9209695  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,7,8 *;
 [PX]WO9631528  (UNIV LEEDS [GB], et al) [PX] 1-20 * claims; page 10, lines 15 and 16; pages 16-23; figure 1/6; figure 6/6 *;
 [PX]WO9637212  (TORREY PINES INST [US]) [PX] 1-20 * claims *;
 [X]  - ILYINA, E. & MAYO, K.H., "Multiple native-like conformations trapped via self-association-induced hydrophobic collapse ...", BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 306, pages 407 - 419, XP002049222 [X] 1-20 * whole disclosure, esp. fig. 1, fig. 3, fig. 9 *
 [X]  - ILYINA, E. ET AL., "Synthetic peptides probe folding initiation sites in platelet factor-4: ...", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 13436 - 13444, XP002049223 [X] 1-20 * whole disclosure *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00249a032
 [XA]  - MILLER, M.D. & KRANGEL, M.S., "Biology and biochemistry of the chemokines: ...", CRIT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 12, no. 1,2, pages 17 - 46, XP002049224 [X] 18 * figure 1; whole disclosure * [A] 1-32
 [PX]  - ILYINA, E. ET AL., "NMR structure of a de novo designed peptide 33mer ...", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19970429), vol. 36, pages 5245 - 5250, XP002049225 [PX] 1-32 * whole disclosure *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi963064o