Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918487

EP0918487 - LIGATING BAND DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
Financial Services Centre P.O. Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael / BB
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Financial Services Centre, P.O. Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael / BB
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Financial Services Centre, P.O. Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael, Barbados / BB
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
BOSTON SCIENTIFIC IRELAND LIMITED
Financial Services Centre, Post Office Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill
Saint Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB
Inventor(s)01 / TOLKOFF, M., Josuha
39 Jordan Road
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
02 / ALVAREZ DE TOLEDO, Fernando
229 Fairhaven Hill
Concord, MA 01742 / US
03 / ZIEGLER, Andrew
11 Cedar Avenue
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
04 / MINTER, Wayne, A.
13 Lincoln Street
Peabody, MA 01960 / US
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Warren, Anthony Robert
BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date97928666.323.05.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997US08947
Priority number, dateUS1996065437428.05.1996         Original published format: US 654374
[1999/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9745060
Date:04.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0918487
Date:02.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0918487
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/10, B65H3/00, B65G29/00, A61B17/12
[2000/16]
Former International [1999/22]A61B17/10, B65H3/00, B65G29/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/22]
TitleGerman:ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR LIGATIONSBÄNDER[1999/22]
English:LIGATING BAND DISPENSER[1999/22]
French:DISTRIBUTEUR DE RUBANS A LIGATURER[1999/22]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1998National basic fee paid 
23.12.1998Search fee paid 
23.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/22]
05.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2005Fee for grant paid
02.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Request for further processing for:11.02.2005Request for further processing filed
11.02.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9534244  (DABEGRAN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 19, line 32 - page 21, line 3; figures 16,18-20 *;
 [A]US5398844  (ZASLAVSKY ELLA [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8-10 * column W *;
 [A]US5320630  (AHMED MUNIR [US]) [A] 1,9 * column A; figures 7-9,11,12 *
International search[X]US5624453  (AHMED MUNIR [US]);
 [X]US5398844  (ZASLAVSKY ELLA [US], et al)