Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0951295

EP0951295 - COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN INHIBITING OF ALPHA-V-BETA3 MEDIATED ANGIOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/43]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR INHIBITION OF ANGIOGENESIS
[2009/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.05.2011  [2011/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2010/23]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
The Scripps Research Institute
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROOKS, Peter
Apartment 6113 3550 Lebon Drive
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / CHERESH, David, A.
2108 Sea Village Circle
Cardiff, CA 92007 / US
 [2003/28]
Former [2000/41]01 / BROOKS, Peter
Apartment 6113 3550 Lebon Drive
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / CHERESH, David, A.
2108 Sea Village Circle
Cardiff, CA 92007 / US
03 / SILLETTI, Steven, Dr., Scripps Research Institute
10550 N Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Former [1999/43]01 / BROOKS, Peter
Apartment 6113 3550 Lebon Drive
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
02 / CHERESH, David, A.
2108 Sea Village Circle
Cardiff, CA 92007 / US
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97928698.630.05.1997
[1999/43]
WO1997US09158
Priority number, dateUS19960018733P31.05.1996         Original published format: US 18733 P
US19960015869P31.05.1996         Original published format: US 15869 P
[1999/46]
Former [1999/43]US19960018773P31.05.1996
US19960015869P31.05.1996
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9745137
Date:04.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0951295
Date:27.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997
[1999/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0951295
Date:09.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/48, A61K39/00, A61P7/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/12
[2009/04]
Former International [1999/43]A61K38/48, A61K39/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/43]
Extension statesAL13.11.1998
LT13.11.1998
LV13.11.1998
RO13.11.1998
SI13.11.1998
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ALPHA-V-BETA3 VERMITTELTER ANGIOGENESIS HEMMERS[2009/04]
English:COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN INHIBITING OF ALPHA-V-BETA3 MEDIATED ANGIOGENESIS[2009/04]
French:COMPOSITIONS POUR L'UTILISATION AFIN D'INHIBER L'ANGIOGENESE MEDIEE PAR ALPHA-V- BETA3[2009/04]
Former [1999/43]VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON ANGIOGENESIS
Former [1999/43]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR INHIBITION OF ANGIOGENESIS
Former [1999/43]PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS INHIBANT L'ANGIOGENESE
Entry into regional phase13.11.1998National basic fee paid 
13.11.1998Search fee paid 
13.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/43]
24.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2010Fee for grant paid
18.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination27.05.2005Appeal received No.  T1127/05
28.07.2005Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2008Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
15.01.2008Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.01.2008Date of oral proceedings
Opposition(s)10.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9528426  (JOLLA CANCER RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9714716  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0770622  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *
 [X]  - H P HAMMES ET AL., "Subcutaneous injection of a cyclic peptide antagonist of vitronectin receptor-type integrins inhibits retinal neovascularization", NATURE MEDICINE., CO US, (199605), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 529 - 533, XP002138522 [X] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0596-529
 [X]  - P C BROOKS ET AL., "Integrin alphaV beta3 antagonists promote tumor regression by inducing apoptosis of angiogenic blood vessels", CELL, NA US, (19941230), vol. 79, pages 1157 - 1164, XP002138523 [X] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(94)90007-8
 [X]  - M FRIEDLANDER ET AL., "Definition of two antagonists pathways by distinct alphaV integrins", SCIENCE., AAAS. LANCASTER, PA., US, (19951201), vol. 270, pages 1500 - 1502, XP000867841 [X] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5241.1500
 [X]  - P C BROOKS ET AL., "Requirement of vascular integrin alphaV beta3 for angiogenesis", SCIENCE., AAAS. LANCASTER, PA., US, (19940422), vol. 264, pages 569 - 571, XP002138524 [X] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7512751
 [X]  - R A CLARK ET AL., "Transient functional expression of alpha.v.beta.3 on vascular cells during wound repair", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960701), vol. 125, no. 1, Database accession no. 7248, XP002138525 [X] 1,6-10,17-23,29-45
    [] - AM. J. PATHOL., (199605), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1407 - 1421, [ ] * abstract *
International search[Y]  - EUR. J. CANCER, 1996, Vol. 32A, No. 1, TIMAR et al., "The Antimetabolite Tiazofurin(TR) Inhibits Glycoconjugate Biosynthesis and Invasiveness of Tumor Cells", pages 152-159.,
 [Y]  - CIRCULATION, November 1994, Vol. 90, No. 5, MATSUNO et al., "Inhibition of Integrin Function by a Cyclic RGD-Containing Peptide Prevents Neointima Formation", pages 2203-2206.,
ExaminationWO9706791
    - HOOD JD ET AL., "Differential alpha-v integrin-mediated Ras-ERK signaling during two pathways of angiogenesis", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (20030901), vol. 162, no. 5, pages 933 - 943,