Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970240

EP0970240 - ARTIFICIAL MISMATCH HYBRIDIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 7365
Madison, WI 53707-7365 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/38]For all designated states
Wisconsin Alumni Research Foundation
614 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 7365
Madison, WI 53707-7365 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 North Walnut Street Post Office Box 7365
Madison Wisconsin 53707-7365 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Zhen
Apartment 1044 14611 N.E. 39th Street
Bellevue, WA 98077 / US
02 / SMITH, Lloyd, M.
1115 Amherst Drive
Madison, WI 53705 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/51]Duckworth, Timothy John
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/02]Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97928870.105.06.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997US09780
Priority number, dateUS1996065960506.06.1996         Original published format: US 659605
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9746711
Date:11.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970240
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970240
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12P19/34
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:KüNSTLICHE FEHLHYBRIDISIERUNG[2000/02]
English:ARTIFICIAL MISMATCH HYBRIDIZATION[2000/02]
French:HYBRIDATION PAR MESAPPARIEMENT ARTIFICIEL[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1998National basic fee paid 
08.12.1998Search fee paid 
08.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/02]
06.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2004Fee for grant paid
08.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
IE08.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
GR12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
PT12.10.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2005/24]AT12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
IE08.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
GR12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/11]AT12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
MC30.06.2004
GR12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI12.05.2004
GR12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI12.05.2004
ES23.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5438131  (BERGSTROM DONALD E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 40 - column 9 *;
 [T]  - GUO Z ET AL, "ENHANCED DISCRIMINATION OF SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISMS BY ARTIFICIAL MISMATCH HYBRIDIZATION", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY,US,NATURE PUBLISHING, (199704), vol. 15, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 331 - 335, XP000867755 [T] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0497-331
 [A]  - NICHOLS R ET AL, "A UNIVERSAL NUCLEOSIDE FOR USE AT AMBIGOUS SITES IN DNA PRIMERS", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, (19940609), vol. 369, no. 6480, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 492 - 493, XP000560346 [A] 1 * see abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/369492a0
International search[A]  - CONNER B. J., ET AL., "DETECTION OF SICKLE CELL BETAS-GLOBIN ALLELE BY HYBRIDIZATION WITH SYNTHETIC OLIGONUCLEOTIDES.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19830101), vol. 80., doi:10.1073/pnas.80.1.278, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 278 - 282., XP002026703

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.80.1.278
 [A]  - DOKTYCZ M. J., ET AL., "OPTICAL MELTING OF 128 OCTAMER DNA DUPLEXES. EFFECTS OF BASE PAIR LOCATION AND NEAREST NEIGHBORS ON THERMAL STABILITY.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19950414), vol. 270., no. 15., doi:10.1074/jbc.270.15.8439, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 8439 - 8445., XP002034049

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.15.8439
 [A]  - LOAKES D, BROWN D M, "5-NITROINDOLE AS AN UNIVERSAL BASE ANALOGUE", Nucleic Acids Research, Information Retrieval Ltd., GB, GB, (19940101), vol. 22, no. 20, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4039 - 4043, XP000999195