blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995055 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995055



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 355
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
18.08.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.09.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.08.2004 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
30.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
30.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
30.07.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.07.2004 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 10
24.03.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.03.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.03.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
18.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
28.08.2003 Description Search / examination 2
28.08.2003 Description Search / examination 7
28.08.2003 Drawings Search / examination 3
28.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 22
09.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
01.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
01.08.2002 Description Search / examination 6
01.08.2002 Description Search / examination 6
01.08.2002 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
30.07.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 31
04.06.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.05.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.01.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
23.01.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.10.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.09.2001 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 European search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.08.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.07.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.07.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.07.2001 European search report Search / examination 2
25.05.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2001 Urgent letter Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.05.1999 Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) Search / examination 1
12.05.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
06.04.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 2
06.04.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 2
07.04.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.01.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
29.01.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 58
29.01.1998 Priority document Search / examination 42
29.01.1998 Priority document Search / examination 30