blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995055


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2008  [2008/07]
23.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
04.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
19.08.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.10.2005  [2005/40]
22.07.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2005  [2005/36]
20.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
13.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
06.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2005  [2005/25]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
27.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  13.10.2004  [2004/42]
09.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.09.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
21.02.2003 Examination report or reply
05.08.2002 Examination report or reply
24.07.2002 Renewal fee
31.05.2002 Examination report or reply
25.01.2002 First examination report
18.01.2002 Examination report or reply
31.08.2001 Supplementary search report published on  17.10.2001 [2001/42]
20.07.2001 Renewal fee
21.07.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
02.02.2000 Renewal fee
25.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
18.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
31.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.1997 PCT data prior to European publication