blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995055
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9803804Global Dossier 29.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
AUPO118496 23.07.1996
AUPO703797 28.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100455071BGlobal Dossier 08.11.2004B1
KR20010021931 15.03.2001A
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002538374Global Dossier 12.11.2002A
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0995055Global Dossier 13.10.2004B1
EP0995055 17.10.2001A4
EP0995055 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT279671T 15.10.2004T
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU731205B 29.03.2001B2
AU3329997 10.02.1998A
Priority number Date
AU3329997 15.07.1997
AUPO118496 23.07.1996
AU9700443 15.07.1997
AUPO703797 28.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4515297 28.01.1999A
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
AU4515297 13.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9714762 25.07.2000A
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
BR9714762 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2295547 03.05.2005C
CA2295547 29.01.1998A1
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69731235D 18.11.2004D1
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69731235T 13.10.2005T2
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL133833 31.07.2003A
IL133833D 30.04.2001D0
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO996590L 14.03.2000L
NO996590D 30.12.1999D0
Priority number Date
NO996590 30.12.1999
AU9700443 15.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ502108 29.06.2001A
Priority number Date
AUPO118496 23.07.1996
AU9700443 15.07.1997
AUPO703797 28.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6342023 29.01.2002B1
Priority number Date
AU9700443 15.07.1997