Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995055

EP0995055 - GEAR PROFILE FOR ORBITAL GEAR TRANSMISSIONS, AND ORBITAL GEAR TRANSMISSION AND WINCHES UTILISING ORBITAL GEAR TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aimbridge Pty. Ltd.
9th Floor, 161 Collins Street
Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLMOT, Eric, Paul
169 Kingsford Smith Drive
Melba, ACT 2615 / AU
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date97929034.315.07.1997
[2000/17]
WO1997AU00443
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9803804
Date:29.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995055
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995055
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU29.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16H1/32, F16H57/10, B66D1/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:ZAHNRADPROFIL FÜR PLANETENGETRIEBE, PLANETENGETRIEBE UND WINDEN DIE EIN PLANETENGETRIEBE VERWENDEN[2000/17]
English:GEAR PROFILE FOR ORBITAL GEAR TRANSMISSIONS, AND ORBITAL GEAR TRANSMISSION AND WINCHES UTILISING ORBITAL GEAR TRANSMISSIONS[2000/17]
French:PROFIL D'ENGRENAGE DESTINE A DES TRANSMISSIONS A ENGRENAGE PLANETAIRE, TRANSMISSION ET CABESTANS A ENGRENAGE PLANETAIRE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL PROFIL[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase30.12.1999National basic fee paid 
30.12.1999Search fee paid 
30.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
30.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
23.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2004Fee for grant paid
29.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.10.2004
BE13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
NL13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
SE13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
PT13.03.2005
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]AT13.10.2004
BE13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
NL13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
SE13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.10.2004
BE13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
NL13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/51]AT13.10.2004
BE13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/46]AT13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
DK13.01.2005
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/36]AT13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/27]CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
GR13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/26]CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
GR13.01.2005
Former [2005/25]CH13.10.2004
FI13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
Former [2005/24]FI13.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0286760  (PEIJI SHEN [CN]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1538008  (SHARKEY WILLIAM E) [A] 1,11 * page 1, column R, line 83 - line 109 *;
 [XA]FR2366466  (HOHENZOLLERN HUETTENVERWALT [DE]) [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1;
 [A]US5398904  (REES RICHARD W A [US]) [A] 1,2,11,12 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 33; figure 9 *
International search[X]US2128815  (JOHN GUEST JAMES);
 [Y]SU1728560  ;
 [Y]SU1768832  ;
 [X]AU5899690  (HELEN LOUISE HARPER);
 [X]AU8415882  (NEWTON A R);
 [X]AU3411868
 [Y]  - ananevsskii v a, dovyhenko n i, karmugikh b v, "High capacity planetary transmission - employs radial reciprocation of rollers in sinusoidal grooves to eliminate impact loads", DATABASE WPI WORLD PATENT INF, (19000101), Database accession no. 1993-108325, XP002948951
 [Y]  - MAKAREVICH D M, PASHKEVICH M F, "Planetary reduction gear for drilling tool used in mining - has driving and driven shafts linked by satellite balls in wavy tracks", DATABASE WPI WORLD PATENT INF, (19000101), Database accession no. 1993-343640, XP002948952