|
22.11.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.11.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.04.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |