Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0928207

EP0928207 - ADHESIVE AGENT AND USE OF SUCH AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
COLOPLAST A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
Inventor(s)01 / NIELSEN, Inger, Mann
Vagtelvej 78
DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK
[1999/28]
Representative(s)Nilausen, Kim
c/o Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[N/P]
Former [1999/28]Nilausen, Kim (DK)
c/o Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1
DK-3050 Humlebaek / DK
Application number, filing date97929140.802.07.1997
[1999/28]
WO1997DK00291
Priority number, dateDK1996000077210.07.1996         Original published format: DK 77296
[1999/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9801167
Date:15.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0928207
Date:14.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[1999/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0928207
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0928207
Date:19.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61L24/00, A61L15/58, C09J11/08
[2002/36]
Former International [1999/28]A61L25/00, A61L15/58, C09J11/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/28]
TitleGerman:KLEBSTOFFEZUBEREITUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[1999/28]
English:ADHESIVE AGENT AND USE OF SUCH AGENT[1999/28]
French:AGENT ADHESIF ET SON UTILISATION[1999/28]
Entry into regional phase21.12.1998National basic fee paid 
21.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/28]
20.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
03.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2002Fee for grant paid
03.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.06.2003  29.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde Schou A/S
Hausergade 3
1128 Copenhagen K / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2003  29.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
Former [2003/32]
Opponent(s)01  13.06.2003   
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
01.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.02.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.02.2007Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.04.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.05.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.08.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.11.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
LU02.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/21]
Former [2005/02]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
LU02.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
LU02.07.2003
Former [2003/48]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/39]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR18.09.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR18.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9600094  (COLOPLAST AS [DK]);
 [A]JP06065073  ;
 [A]US5420114  (CLODMAN PERCY B [CA], et al);
 [A]WO8910750  (BUSCIGLIO JOHN A [US])
 [A]  - File WPI, Derwent Accession No. 94-121171, SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD, "Waterproof Adhesive Plaster Giving Pharmaceutical Effect - has Waterproof Backing and Adhesive Layer Contg. Pharmaceuticals e.g. D,L-alpha-Tocopherol"; & JP,A,06 065 073, (08-03-94), DW9415.,
OppositionWO9531188
 JPH0665073
 US4695465
 US5466724
 US4750482
 US5492943
 US5336305