Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934309

EP0934309 - NEW PYRIDYL ALKANE ACID AMIDES AS CYTOSTATICS AND IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujisawa Deutschland GmbH
Berg-am-Laim-Strasse 129
81673 München / DE
[2002/16]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
Klinge Pharma GmbH
Berg-am-Laim-Strasse 129
D-81673 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BIEDERMANN, Elfi
Zugspitzstrasse 93
D-85591 Vaterstetten / DE
02 / HASMANN, Max
Lerchenweg 9
D-82061 Neuried / DE
03 / LÖSER, Roland
Fichtenweg 2
D-82340 Feldafing / DE
04 / RATTEL, Benno
Eichelhäherstrasse 3
D-81249 Munich / DE
05 / REITER, Friedemann
Zugspitzstrasse 36
D-85640 Putzbrunn / DE
06 / SCHEIN, Barbara
Sudetenweg 4
D-85375 Neufahrn / DE
07 / SEIBEL, Klaus
Haberlstrasse 9
D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE
08 / VOGT, Klaus
Balanstrasse 63
D-81541 Munich / DE
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97929240.620.06.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997EP03243
Priority number, dateDE199612470420.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19624704
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9748695
Date:24.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934309
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934309
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/12, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, A61K31/44, C07D401/14
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
TitleGerman:PYRIDYLALKAN-SÄUREAMIDE ALS CYTOSTATIKA UND IMMUNOSUPRESSIVE ARZNEIMITTEL[1999/32]
English:NEW PYRIDYL ALKANE ACID AMIDES AS CYTOSTATICS AND IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVES[1999/32]
French:NOUVEAUX AMIDES A ACIDES PYRIDYL-ALCANE UTILISES COMME CYTOSTATIQUES ET IMMUNOSUPPRESSEURS[1999/32]
Entry into regional phase13.01.1999National basic fee paid 
13.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
26.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
20.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
22.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2002Fee for grant paid
20.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9115485  (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]) [AD] 1-40 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9115484  (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB [DE]) [A] 1-40 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0330026  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract *;
 [AD]EP0343307  (ESPANOLA PROD QUIMICOS [ES]) [AD] * abstract *