Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0938885

EP0938885 - COSMETIC PREPARATIONS CONTAINING FLUORINATED OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MORITA, Masamichi, Yodogawa Wks.of Daikin Ind. Ltd
1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
02 / SEKI, Eiji, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Ind. Ltd.
1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
03 / KUBO, Motonobu, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Ind.
1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
[1999/35]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97929542.507.07.1997
[1999/35]
WO1997JP02343
Priority number, dateJP1996017783708.07.1996         Original published format: JP 17783796
[1999/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9801104
Date:15.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0938885
Date:01.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[1999/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00, A61K7/02, A61K7/48
[2000/04]
Former International [1999/35]A61K7/00, A61K7/02
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1999/35]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN, ENTHALTEND FLUORINIERTE ÖLE[1999/35]
English:COSMETIC PREPARATIONS CONTAINING FLUORINATED OILS[1999/35]
French:PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES CONTENANT DES HUILES FLUOREES[1999/35]
Entry into regional phase18.01.1999Translation filed 
18.01.1999National basic fee paid 
18.01.1999Search fee paid 
18.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/35]
20.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
15.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0633016  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4 * claim - *
International search[A]JPH05331019  (NIHON SURFACTANT KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH07138130  (KOSE CORP);
 [A]JPH03256211  (HITACHI ELECTR ENG);
 [AP]JPH08299782  (SHISEIDO CO LTD)