Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0921831

EP0921831 - MULTI-LUMEN CATHETER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEARTPORT, INC.
200 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City
California 94063 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
HEARTPORT, INC.
200 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, California 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORVI, Timothy, J.
2730 Sequoia Way
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
02 / STEVENS, John, H.
727E Loma Verde Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date97930012.617.06.1997
[1999/24]
WO1997US10346
Priority number, dateUS1996066471617.06.1996         Original published format: US 664716
US1997078211313.01.1997         Original published format: US 782113
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9748434
Date:24.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0921831
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997
[1999/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/00, B29D23/00
[2000/17]
Former International [1999/24]A61M25/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:MEHRLUMIGER KATHETER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[1999/24]
English:MULTI-LUMEN CATHETER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[1999/24]
French:CATHETER A PASSAGES MULTIPLES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1999/24]
Entry into regional phase11.01.1999National basic fee paid 
11.01.1999Search fee paid 
11.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
24.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
12.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PY]WO9633763  (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [PY] 1,2 * page 17, line 17 - page 19, line 30 *;
 [Y]US5464394  (MILLER ARNOLD [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 42 - line 62; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4795439  (GUEST ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1,3 * column W *;
 [A]US5514236  (AVELLANET ERNESTO [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 6; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]EP0277366  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 4 * page 3, column 4, line 44 - line 54; figure 3 *
International search[X]US5300025  (WANTINK KENNETH L [US]);
 [X]US5190520  (FENTON JR PAUL V [US], et al);
 [X]US5464394  (MILLER ARNOLD [US], et al);
 [XP]US5549557  (STEINKE THOMAS A [US], et al)