blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990360


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.08.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.09.2005  [2005/39]
15.10.2004 Change - representative published on  01.12.2004  [2004/49]
20.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
11.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.08.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.03.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.06.2003 Renewal fee
05.02.2003 Examination report or reply
18.10.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
18.10.2002 Examination report or reply
11.10.2002 Change - representative published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
03.09.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
25.06.2002 Renewal fee
22.03.2002 First examination report
20.03.2002 Examination report or reply
13.06.2001 Renewal fee
14.06.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
01.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2000 Renewal fee
15.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
07.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication