blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0990360

Designated contracting states DE 
 FI 
 FR 
 SE 
Examination procedure02.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted06.10.2004
Opposition procedure07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 21.09.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR SE
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000117
 
Event date:08.05.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020325
 
Event date:06.10.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR SE
 
Event date:12.10.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:11.11.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69731125
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20041111
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:12.08.2005 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:28.09.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050707
 
Event date:11.05.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20070511
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:05.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20070605
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:29.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20070629
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20070605
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:17.02.2009 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:27.02.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080617
 
Event date:17.04.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20090228
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090101
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080630
 
Event date:30.07.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080618