Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990360

EP0990360 - WIRELESS DEVICE, CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR PROTECTED SITES WITH OPERATION ACCORDING TO INTERFERENCE PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.09.2005  [2005/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motorola Limited
Jays Close, Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke
Hampshire RG22 4PD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Motorola Limited
Jays Close, Viables Industrial Estate
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4PD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WHINNETT, Nicholas, William
7, rue de la Cerisaie
F-75004 Paris / FR
02 / VAN DEN HEUVEL, Anthony, P.
11823 North Abbey Lane
Fountain Hills, AZ 85268 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)McCormack, Derek James , et al
Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]McCormack, Derek James , et al
Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2002/48]McCormack, Derek James , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Former [2000/14]Potts, Susan Patricia , et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date97930371.617.06.1997
[2000/14]
WO1997EP03191
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858514
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990360
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990360
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04B7/185
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:SCHNURLOSES GERÄT, STEUERUNGSVERRFAHREN UND -SYSTEM FÜR GESCHÜTZTE ORTE MIT INTERFERENZPARAMETERN ENTSPRECHENDEM BETRIEB[2000/14]
English:WIRELESS DEVICE, CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR PROTECTED SITES WITH OPERATION ACCORDING TO INTERFERENCE PARAMETERS[2000/14]
French:DISPOSITIF SANS FIL, SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE COMMANDE DE SITES PROTEGES AU MOYEN D'UN FONCTIONNEMENT DEPENDANT DE PARAMETRES DE BROUILLAGE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
23.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2004Fee for grant paid
02.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XA]FR2721462  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,19,22 * figures 1-9; claims 1-10 * [A] 2-18,20,21,23-34;
 [XA]FR2737364  (EXCEM [FR]) [X] 1,19,22 * figure 1; claims 1-10 * [A] 2-18,20,21,23-34;
 [XA]WO9631016  (INT MOBILE SATELLITE ORG [GB]) [X] 1,19,22 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 23; figures 1-10 * [A] 2-18,20,21,23-34;
 [A]WO9507587  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1-34 * page 3, line 27 - page 6, line 12 *