Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963283

EP0963283 - PROCESS FOR MAKING DECORATIVE AUTOMOTIVE INTERIOR TRIM ARTICLES WITH INTEGRAL LIGHT STABLE POLYURETHANE ELASTOMER COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.11.2010
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Change - designated statespublished on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Interior Systems Inc.
337 Magna Drive Aurora
Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA
[2010/49]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
Magna Interior Systems Inc.
337 Magna Drive
Aurora, Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / GARDNER, John, A., Jr.
48 A Baker Avenue
Deerfield, NH 03037 / US
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Pfiz, Thomas
Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB
Tübinger Strasse 26
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Pfiz, Thomas, Dr.
Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/09]Kovac, Werner
Magna Steyr AG & Co KG, Patentabteilung Magna-Strasse 1
2522 Oberwaltersdorf / AT
Former [1999/50]Kovac, Werner
c/o Steyr-Daimler-Puch AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Franz-Josefs-Kai 51
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date97930705.508.07.1997
[1999/50]
WO1997IB00934
Priority number, dateUS1997079029131.01.1997         Original published format: US 790291
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9833634
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0963283
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963283
Date:19.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0963283
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:B29C41/08, B29C41/22, B29C44/14, B29C67/24, B60R13/02, B29K75/00
[2007/06]
Former International [1999/50]B29C41/08, B29C41/22, B29C44/14, B29C67/24, B60R13/02, // B29K75:00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2011/12]
Former [2010/49]AT,  BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2003/02]AT,  BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  LI 
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DEKORATIVEN KRAFTFAHRZEUGINNENVERKLEIDUNGEN MIT VOLLSTÄNDIGER UND LICHTSTABILER POLYURETHANELASTOMERBESCHICHTUNG[2010/23]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING DECORATIVE AUTOMOTIVE INTERIOR TRIM ARTICLES WITH INTEGRAL LIGHT STABLE POLYURETHANE ELASTOMER COVERING[1999/50]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES ARTICLES DE GARNITURE INTERIEURE DECORATIFS POUR AUTOMOBILES, AVEC REVETEMENT INTEGRAL EN ELASTOMERE DE POLYURETHANNE STABLE A LA LUMIERE[2001/20]
Former [1999/50]VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DEKORATIVEN AUSSTATTUNGSGEGENSTÄNDEN FÜR FAHRZEUGE MIT LEICHTER, INTEGRIERTER UND STABILER POLYURETHANELASTOMERBESCHICHTUNG
Former [1999/50]PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES ARTICLES DE GARNITURE INTERIEURE DECORATIFS POUR AUTOMOBILES, AVEC REVETEMENT D'UNE SEULE PIECE EN ELASTOMERE DE POLYURETHANNE STABLE A LA LUMIERE
Entry into regional phase11.08.1999National basic fee paid 
11.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
12.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2001Fee for grant paid
23.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.11.2003  17.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
RECTICEL
Plejadenlaan 15
1200 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Van Reet, Joseph, et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/04]
Opponent(s)01  19.11.2003   
RECTICEL
Plejadenlaan 15
1200 Brussel / BE
Opponent's representative
Van Reet, Joseph, et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
20.01.2004No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
31.01.2004No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
13.02.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.10.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.02.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.02.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.08.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.09.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition17.04.2007Appeal received No.  T0648/07
19.06.2007Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Request for further processing for:21.12.2001Request for further processing filed
21.12.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.03.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2002
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.08.199903   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE19.05.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/02]DE28.02.2003
SE19.05.2003
Former [2003/32]SE19.05.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0744264  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-17 * page 2, line 25 - line 59; example 1; claims 1-7 *;
 [DY]WO9323237  (RECTICEL [BE], et al) [DY] 1-3,6-17 * figures 1-5; examples 1-5; claims 1,11,13-17 *;
 [Y]EP0425240  (BRIDGESTONE AUSTRALIA [AU]) [Y] 1-3,6-17 * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-4; claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]US4822549  (VERWILST JACQUES [BE], et al) [Y] 4 * figure 5; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0871177  ;
 [A]US4350777  (HENRICHS PAUL, et al) [A] 1,14 * column 13, line 26 - column 15, line 15; example 7 *;
 [A]EP0392285  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * page 9, line 12 - line 44 *;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, [A] 1,2,14,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - "ELASTOGRAN FRANCE: NOUVEAU PROCEDE POUR LES PANNEAUX DE PORTES", INGENIEURS DE L'AUTOMOBILE, (19921001), no. 676, page 63, XP000307648 [A] 1,14 * the whole document *
OppositionUS5051310
 EP0386818
 EP0552420
 EP0646609
 US4764553
 EP0507407
 US5013508
 US4447486
 EP0120305
 US3412054
 US5300325
 US4278578
 US5880183
 US5066705
 US3624045
 US4096202
    - "Pages: 284 - 293, 306 - 308, 344, 672, 685, 700 - 704", SWARAJ PAUL, Surface Coatings, Science and Technology, 2nd Edition, CHICHESTER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, ISBN 047195818,
    - MARC EYCKMANS, AXEL KAMPRATH, "Armaturentafel-Häute, hergestellt im Sprühverfahren", MARC EYCKMANS, AXEL KAMPRATH, VEREIN DEUTSCHER INGENIEURE, PUR-Technik 1996, DÜSSELDORF, VDI VERLAG, pages 47 - 48,
    - ALLINGER, ET AL, Organische Chemie,(dt.), BERLIN/NEW YORK, DE GRUYTER & CO., pages 886 - 887, ISBN 311004594X,
    - SAECHTLING, HANSJÜRGEN, International Plastics Handbook, 3rd edition, MÜNCHEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, pages 360 - 361, ISBN 1569901821,
    - "Ucarink Crosslinker XL-29SE", Cydrothane, HTTP:/WWW.CYTEC.COM/PDF/CYDROTHANE.PDF, CYTEC, page 10,
    - SAUNDERS ET AL, Polyurethanes Chemistry and Technology, Part 1 Chemistry, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERSM A DIVISION OF JOHN WILEY & SONS, page 117&72,
    - STAHL HOLDINGS BV, webpage http:/www.stahl.com/index.asp?do=1119&page=News/Technical-Information,
    - KING, CHRIS, "Polyesters for the use in the Fiberglass Industry", KING, CHRIS, WANSBROUGH, HEATHER, WEBPAGE: HTTP://WWW.NZIC.ORG.NZ/CHEMPROCESSES/POLYMERS/10B.PDF.,