Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979483

EP0979483 - HAND-HOLDABLE OPTICAL SCANNER PARTICULARLY USEFUL AS ELECTRONIC TRANSLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wizcom Technologies Ltd.
8B Hamarpe Street
Jerusalem 97774 / IL
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / LIPMAN, Adi
Derech Hachof Street 8
40297 Michmoret / IL
02 / LIPMAN, Aharon
Derech Hachof Street 8
40297 Michmoret / IL
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridge
PE27 5PD / GB
Former [2000/07]Evens, Paul Jonathan , et al
Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street
St. Ives, Cambridge PE17 4EB / GB
Application number, filing date97930721.214.07.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997IL00238
Priority number, dateIL1996011891422.07.1996         Original published format: IL 11891496
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9803932
Date:29.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979483
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER SCANNER MIT HAND ZU HALTEN INSBESONDERE ZU VERWENDEN ALS ELEKTRONISCHER ÜBERSETZER[2000/07]
English:HAND-HOLDABLE OPTICAL SCANNER PARTICULARLY USEFUL AS ELECTRONIC TRANSLATOR[2000/07]
French:LECTEUR OPTIQUE PORTATIF UTILE NOTAMMENT COMME TRADUCTEUR ELECTRONIQUE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase15.02.1999National basic fee paid 
15.02.1999Search fee paid 
15.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
18.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
11.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4707747  (ROCKWELL III MARSHALL A [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 17; figure 2 *;
 [X]JPH04205580  ;
 [X]US5063508  (YAMADA YOSHIMI [JP], et al) [X] 11,12,15,16 * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]EP0657837  (INT DES JEUX [FR]) [A] 13,14 * column 1, line 1 - line 54 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921117), vol. 016, no. 547, Database accession no. (P - 1452), [X] 11 * abstract *
International search[X]US4906843  (JONES TERRILL H [US], et al);
 [YP]US5550362  (SHERMAN DAVID M [US]);
 [A]US5012349  (DE FAY STEFAN G [FR]);
 [A]US4793812  (SUSSMAN MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US4701804  (TOYODA KENJI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4574317  (SCHEIBLE WAYNE [US])