Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995253

EP0995253 - ELECTRIC INSTALLATION PROTECTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dekel, Aram
Sha'ar Yishuv 11, Ramot B
92780 Jerusalem / IL
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date97930725.317.07.1997
[2000/17]
WO1997IL00244
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904474
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995253
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02H9/04, H02H5/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER INSTALLATIONSSCHUTZ[2000/17]
English:ELECTRIC INSTALLATION PROTECTING MEANS[2000/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'INSTALLATION ELECTRIQUE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Search fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
02.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
22.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/36]
Request for further processing for:16.08.2003Request for further processing filed
16.08.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.09.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200004   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001
31.07.200105   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2002
31.07.200206   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2002
31.07.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3872355  (KLEIN KEITH WILLIAM, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,3,4 *
International search[X]US5023744  (HOFSAESS PETER [DE]);
 [X]US5590010  (CEOLA GIACOMO [IT], et al);
 [X]US4547830  (YAMAUCHI YOSHIO [JP]);
 [X]US4618906  (PAICE DEREK A [US], et al);
 [X]US4858054  (FRANKLIN FREDERICK F [US])