Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853342

EP0853342 - CONNECTING STRUCTURE BETWEEN WIRING BOARD AND PLUG MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/29]PLUG-IN TYPE ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT, CONNECTING STRUCTURE BETWEEN WIRING BOARD AND PLUG MEMBER, CONNECTING UNIT BETWEEN ELECTRONIC PARTS AND WIRING BOARD, AND ELECTRONIC PARTS MOUNTING METHOD
[2007/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.11.2008  [2008/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[2007/46]
Former [1998/29]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE, Masajiro
K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 itama 351-01 / JP
[1998/29]
Representative(s)Herzog, Markus , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patentanwälte
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date97930854.122.07.1997
[1998/29]
WO1997JP02518
Priority number, dateJP1996019212022.07.1996         Original published format: JP 19212096
JP1996019211922.07.1996         Original published format: JP 19211996
JP1997014898406.06.1997         Original published format: JP 14898497
[1998/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9804000
Date:29.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0853342
Date:15.07.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998
[1998/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853342
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L25/04, H01L21/60, H05K3/32, H05K7/10
[2000/17]
Former International [1998/29]H01L25/04, H01L21/60, H01L23/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/29]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN LEITERPLATTE UND STECKERELEMENT[2007/20]
English:CONNECTING STRUCTURE BETWEEN WIRING BOARD AND PLUG MEMBER[2007/20]
French:STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION ENTRE UN TABLEAU DE CONNEXION ET DES FICHES[2007/20]
Former [1998/29]EINSTECKBARE KONTROLLEINHEIT, VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN LEITERPLATTE UND STECKERELEMENT, VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN ELEKTRONIKTEIL UND LEITERPLATTE UND ELETRONIKTEIL-MONTAGEMETHODE
Former [1998/29]PLUG-IN TYPE ELECTRONIC CONTROL UNIT, CONNECTING STRUCTURE BETWEEN WIRING BOARD AND PLUG MEMBER, CONNECTING UNIT BETWEEN ELECTRONIC PARTS AND WIRING BOARD, AND ELECTRONIC PARTS MOUNTING METHOD
Former [1998/29]UNITE DE COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE DE TYPE ENFICHABLE, STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION ENTRE UN TABLEAU DE CONNEXION ET DES FICHES, UNITE DE CONNEXION ENTRE DES PIECES ELECTRONIQUES ET UN TABLEAU DE CONNEXION ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE DE PIECES ELECTRONIQUES
Entry into regional phase18.03.1998Translation filed 
18.03.1998National basic fee paid 
18.03.1998Search fee paid 
18.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/29]
27.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2007Fee for grant paid
07.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE15.02.2008
[2008/48]
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2293502  (METHODE ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US4373778  (ADHAM JAWAD F) [X] 5 * the whole document * [A] 8;
 [A]GB2287364  (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3237356  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *
International search[X]JPH04164359  (NEC CORP);
 [X]JPS57166051  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JPH02503494  ;
 [A]JPS6149443  (IBM);
 [A]JPH02137357  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [A]JPH06333984  (NEC CORP);
 [A]JPH03283378  (CANON KK, et al);
 [A]JPH056920  (TOSHIBA CORP)