Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963214

EP0963214 - SELF-VENTING ELASTOMERIC BALLOON CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis MN 55432-3576 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FOLLMER, Brett, A.
690 Civic Center Drive, 101
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
02 / TREMULIS, William, S.
97 Pelican Lane
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
03 / McGURK, Erin
323 Stanford Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [1999/50]01 / FOLLMER, Brett, A.
690 Civic Center Drive, #101
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
02 / TREMULIS, William, S.
97 Pelican Lane
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
03 / McGURK, Erin
323 Stanford Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Representative(s)Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97931227.916.06.1997
[1999/50]
WO1997US10509
Priority number, dateUS1996066753621.06.1996         Original published format: US 667536
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9748326
Date:24.12.1997
Language:EN
[1998/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0963214
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997
[1999/50]
Search report(s)International search reportUS19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M29/00
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesCH,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1999/50]
TitleGerman:SELBSTENTLÜFTENDER ELASTOMERER BALLONKATHETER[1999/50]
English:SELF-VENTING ELASTOMERIC BALLOON CATHETER[1999/50]
French:CATHETER A BALLONNET ELASTOMERE AUTOVENTILE[1999/50]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1998National basic fee paid 
24.12.1998Search fee paid 
24.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/50]
24.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/34]
17.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0355200  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1-22 * ref. no. 48 *; column A; figure 2 *
International search[X]US5256143  (MILLER GARY H [US], et al)