Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968224

EP0968224 - CHIMERIC MUTATIONAL VECTORS HAVING NON-NATURAL NUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
1020 Locust Street Philadelphia
PA 19107 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
1020 Locust Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KMIEC, Eric, B.
1570 Reaper Court
Yardley, PA 19067 / US
[2000/14]
Former [2000/01]01 / KMIEC, Eric, B.
1 Lapp Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
Representative(s)Main, Malcolm Charles
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Main, Malcolm Charles
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2005/40]Main, Malcolm Charles
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB
Former [2002/43]Purdy, Hugh Barry , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2002/38]McNally, Roisin , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2000/01]Silveston, Judith , et al
ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97931232.916.06.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US10538
Priority number, dateUS1996066448717.06.1996         Original published format: US 664487
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9748714
Date:24.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968224
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/00, C12P19/34, A61K31/70, C12N15/11
[2000/48]
Former International [2000/01]C07H21/00, C12P19/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:CHIMAERE MUTATIONSVEKTOREN MIT EINEM NICHT-NATUERLICHEN NUCLEOTID[2000/01]
English:CHIMERIC MUTATIONAL VECTORS HAVING NON-NATURAL NUCLEOTIDES[2000/01]
French:VECTEURS MUTATIONNELS CHIMERES A NUCLEOTIDES NON NATURELS[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase18.12.1998National basic fee paid 
18.12.1998Search fee paid 
18.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/01]
15.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/12]
31.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200307   M06   Fee paid on   06.10.2003
30.06.200610   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2006
30.06.200812   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO9515972  (UNIV JEFFERSON [US]) [YD] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9741141  (UNIV JEFFERSON [US]) [E] 1-39 * the whole document *
 [YD]  KMIEC E.B., ET AL., "Targeted gene correction of episomal DNA in mammalian cells mediated by a chimeric RNA-DNA oligonucleotide", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 2071 - 2076, XP002068332 [YD] 1-39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.5.2071
 [Y]  S.T. CROOKE, B. LEBLEU (EDITORS); N.K. TANNER AND M. VASSEUR, "Control of gene expression by synthetic ribozymes", ANTISENSE RESEARCH AND APPLICATIONS, (1993), pages 415 - 426, XP002149689 [Y] 1-39 * page 420-1; stabilization of preformed ribozymes by modifications, in particular 2nd paragraph on page 421 *
International search[YP]US5565350  (KMIEC ERIC B [US]);
 [Y]US5466786  (BUHR CHRIS A [US], et al)
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL REVIEWS, June 1990, Volume 90, Number 4, UHLMANN et al., "Antisense Oligonucleotides: A New Therapeutic Principle", pages 543-584.,
 [Y]  - SCIENCE, 06 December 1991, Volume 254, NIELSEN et al., "Sequence-Selective Recognition of DNA by Strand Displacement with a Thymine-Substituted Polyamide", pages 1497-1500.,
 [Y]  - LEHNINGER, "Biochemistry", NEW YORK: WORTH PUBLISHERS, INC., 1975, Second Edition, pages 309-333.,