Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016321

EP1016321 - HEATING CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYCHEM CORPORATION
300 Constitution Drive, Mail Stop 120/6600
Menlo Park, CA 94025-1164 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
RAYCHEM CORPORATION
300 Constitution Drive, Mail Stop 120/6600
Menlo Park, CA 94025-1164 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JANVRIN, Aron, K.
160 Lincoln Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
02 / OSTERHOUT, Glen, W.
376 Fieldstone Drive
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/45]Jones, David Colin , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2000/27]Jay, Anthony William
Tyco Electronics UK Limited European Patent Department Faraday Road
Dorcan Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB
Application number, filing date97931407.724.06.1997
[2000/27]
WO1997US11057
Priority number, dateUS1996067260328.06.1996         Original published format: US 672603
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9801010
Date:08.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016321
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016321
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)International search reportEP08.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:H05B3/14
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:HEIZLEITUNG[2000/27]
English:HEATING CABLE[2000/27]
French:CABLE CHAUFFANT[2003/46]
Former [2000/27]CABLE DE CHAUFFAGE
Entry into regional phase02.12.1998National basic fee paid 
02.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.12.1998Examination requested  [2000/27]
28.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2004Fee for grant paid
19.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
IT26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
PT26.10.2004
[2008/07]
Former [2006/13]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/18]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0096492  (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-10 * page 18, paragraph L - page 19, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [Y]BE655558  (IOCO LTD) [Y] 1-5,7-10 * page 2 - page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0235454  (SUNBEAM CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,6 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9112701  (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 10, paragraph 3; figure 2 *