Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0912291

EP0912291 - PRECISION DRILL SHARPENER AND GRINDING WHEEL ASSEMBLY THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bernard, David
220 E. Hersey Street, P.O. Box 227
Ashland, OR 97530 / US
[1999/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/46]
Former [1999/18]01 / BERNARD, David
220 E. Hersey Street, P.O. Box 227
Ashland, OR 97530 / US
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [1999/18]Ablett, Graham Keith , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date97931560.303.07.1997
[1999/18]
WO1997US11734
Priority number, dateUS1996067588105.07.1996         Original published format: US 675881
[1999/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9801259
Date:15.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0912291
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[1999/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0912291
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:B24B3/24, B24B3/26, B24D5/10, B24D5/16
[1999/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/18]
TitleGerman:HOCHGENAUE BOHRERSCHLEIFVORRICHTUNG UND SCHLEIFSCHEIBENAUFBAU DAZU[1999/18]
English:PRECISION DRILL SHARPENER AND GRINDING WHEEL ASSEMBLY THEREFOR[1999/18]
French:MACHINE DE PRECISION A AFFUTER DES FORETS ET ENSEMBLE MEULE POUR CETTE DERNIERE[1999/20]
Former [1999/18]MACHINE DE PRECISION A AFF TER DES FORETS ET ENSEMBLE MEULE POUR CETTE DERNIERE
Entry into regional phase01.02.1999National basic fee paid 
01.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/18]
07.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2002Fee for grant paid
03.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02076661.4  / EP1234633
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5400546  (CHRISTIAN WILLIAM C [US], et al) [DA] 1,12,14,21,22 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 12 *;
 [A]US4742648  (KETTERINGHAM THOMAS [GB]) [A] 1,7,9,21 * column 9, line 4 - line 66; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US4455786  (MAYSILLES LYNN A [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 43 - line 68; figures 5,6,12,13,25 *;
 [A]EP0405338  (V P M S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * page 3, column 4, line 32 - line 54; figure 1 *;
 [XA]EP0445568  (WINTER & SOHN ERNST [DE]) [X] 23,24,26 * page 3, column 4, line 3 - line 53; figure - * [A] 15-19;
 [A]US5111624  (SHOENHAIR JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 20,25 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH05146972
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930928), vol. 017, no. 537, Database accession no. (M - 1487), [A] 15 * abstract *