Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0910861

EP0910861 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TYCO Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG
AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KERN, Josef
Hoka III Strasse Q Nr. 7
D-13629 Berlin / DE
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach (SG) / CH
Application number, filing date97931620.517.06.1997
[1999/17]
WO1997DE01229
Priority number, dateDE199612784510.07.1996         Original published format: DE 19627845
[1999/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9801878
Date:15.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0910861
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[1999/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0910861
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01H49/00
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN RELAIS[1999/17]
English:PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY[1999/17]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE[1999/17]
Entry into regional phase05.01.1999National basic fee paid 
05.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/17]
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.02.2000
[2008/07]
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2556610  (SAUER HANS) [A] 1 * page 7, line 20 - page 8; figure 5 *;
 [A]DE2451895  (SAUER HANS) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3620942  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *