Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0912860

EP0912860 - RECESSED LUMINAIRE WITH RETAINING MEANS FOR RETAINING IT IN A MOUNTING BODY OR RETAINING MEANS FOR SUCH A RECESSED LUMINAIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2001
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zumtobel Staff GmbH
Schweizer Strasse 30
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
Zumtobel Staff GmbH
Schweizerstrasse 30
6851 Dornbirn / AT
Inventor(s)01 / KEMPTER, Georg
Blumenstrasse 7b
A-6900 Bregenz / AT
02 / HOCH, Peter
Weissachergasse 11
A-6850 Dornbirn / AT
[1999/18]
Representative(s)Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date97931756.703.07.1997
[1999/18]
WO1997EP03503
Priority number, dateDE199612990124.07.1996         Original published format: DE 19629901
[1999/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9804868
Date:05.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0912860
Date:06.05.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1999/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0912860
Date:04.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:F21V21/04
[1999/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/18]
TitleGerman:EINBAULEUCHTE MIT HALTEMITTELN ZU IHRER HALTERUNG IN EINEM EINBAUKÖRPER ODER HALTEMITTEL FÜR EINE SOLCHE EINBAULEUCHTE[1999/18]
English:RECESSED LUMINAIRE WITH RETAINING MEANS FOR RETAINING IT IN A MOUNTING BODY OR RETAINING MEANS FOR SUCH A RECESSED LUMINAIRE[1999/18]
French:LUMINAIRE ENCASTRE COMPORTANT DES MOYENS DE RETENUE POUR SA FIXATION DANS UN CORPS DE FIXATION, OU MOYENS DE RETENUE POUR UN TEL LUMINAIRE[1999/18]
Entry into regional phase17.11.1998National basic fee paid 
17.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/18]
13.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2000Fee for grant paid
19.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES04.10.2000
FI04.10.2000
FR04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
IT04.10.2000
DK04.01.2001
SE04.01.2001
LU03.07.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]ES04.10.2000
FI04.10.2000
FR04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
DK04.01.2001
SE04.01.2001
LU03.07.2001
Former [2004/39]ES04.10.2000
FI04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
DK04.01.2001
SE04.01.2001
FR02.03.2001
LU03.07.2001
Former [2003/46]ES04.10.2000
FI04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
DK04.01.2001
SE04.01.2001
FR02.03.2001
Former [2002/27]ES04.10.2000
FI04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
SE04.01.2001
FR02.03.2001
Former [2002/02]FI04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
SE04.01.2001
FR02.03.2001
Former [2001/51]FI04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
SE04.01.2001
Former [2001/29]FI04.10.2000
GB04.10.2000
Former [2001/28]GB04.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0525907  (REGGIANI ILLUMINAZIONE [IT]) [AD] 1-4 * column 1, line 43 - column 4, line 33; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4419717  (PRICE EDISON A [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3 *