Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979512

EP0979512 - INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R. BROOKS ASSOCIATES, INC.
6546 Pound Road
Williamson, NY 14589 / US
[2004/48]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
R. BROOKS ASSOCIATES, INC.
P.O. Box 588
Ontario, NY 14519 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHANG, Cedric, G.
50 Webster Manor Drive
Webster, NY 14580 / US
02 / GAY, John, M.
364 French Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
03 / HARRIS, William, J.
262 Hook Road
Farmington, NY 14425 / US
04 / LEFEBVRE, Donald, R.
11870 CMTO Ronaldo n. 238
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
05 / RADIGAN, Terry, M.
9939 Scottsville-Chili Road
Scottsville, NY 14546 / US
06 / YADZINSKI, Gregory, J.
12507 loston Circle n. 102
Fairfax, VA 22033 / US
 [2004/01]
Former [2000/07]01 / CHANG, Cedric, G.
50 Webster Manor Drive
Webster, NY 14580 / US
02 / GAY, John, M.
364 French Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
03 / HARRIS, William, J.
262 Hook Road
Farmington, NY 14425 / US
04 / LEFEBVRE, Donald, R.
11870 CMTO Ronaldo n.238
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
05 / RADIGAN, Terry, M.
9939 Scottsville-Chili Road
Scottsville, NY 14546 / US
06 / YADZINSKI, Gregory, J.
12507 loston Circle n. 102
Fairfax, VA 22033 / US
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/40]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/07]Carpmael, John William Maurice
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97932174.213.06.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US10198
Priority number, dateUS19960019784P14.06.1996         Original published format: US 19784 P
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9750005
Date:31.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/57]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979512
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979512
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G21C17/017
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:INSPEKTIONSGERAET[2000/07]
English:INSPECTION DEVICE[2000/07]
French:APPAREIL POUR INSPECTION[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase12.01.1999National basic fee paid 
12.01.1999Search fee paid 
12.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
25.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
23.10.2003Fee for grant paid
23.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52]
Request for further processing for:23.10.2003Request for further processing filed
23.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.11.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200206   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]US5504788  (BROOKS RAYMOND J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,11-14 * column W *;
 [X]WO9530861  (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7,11-15 * page 14, lines 1-16; figures 2,4,6,7 *;
 [PX]JPH0990084  ;
 [A]US5069172  (SHIREY RAY A [US], et al) [A] 1,12,16 * column W *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 97, no. 8, [PX] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]US4393920  (SHIMA MICHITSUNE [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5117897  (ROBERT NICOLAS M B [FR]);
 [Y]US5265129  (BROOKS RAYMOND J [US], et al)