blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974101 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974101



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 398
02.05.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.06.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.05.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.05.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 14
08.05.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 13
29.12.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.12.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.12.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 53
02.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 13
02.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 13
02.10.2006 Description Search / examination 7
02.10.2006 Description Search / examination 7
02.10.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.07.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
06.07.2006 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
27.06.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.05.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 13
10.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Description Search / examination 4
10.05.2006 Description Search / examination 7
10.05.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.03.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
31.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.07.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 27
05.07.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
29.05.2000 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.05.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.05.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
17.05.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.05.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Preparation for B publication Search / examination 1
10.05.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
20.03.1999 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
12.03.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
18.01.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.12.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 19
01.12.1998 Description Search / examination 7
01.12.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.12.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.12.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.04.1998 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
10.03.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
08.01.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 70
08.01.1998 Priority document Search / examination 62