blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974101


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.05.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.06.2008  [2008/23]
06.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.05.2007 (Expected) grant published on  27.06.2007  [2007/26]
16.05.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.05.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.12.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.10.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.05.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.03.2006 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.10.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2002 Renewal fee
14.06.2001 Renewal fee
14.06.2000 Renewal fee
19.05.2000 Change - classification published on  05.07.2000 [2000/27]
12.05.2000 Supplementary search report published on  28.06.2000 [2000/26]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
09.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.1999 Renewal fee
22.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
07.04.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
15.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication