blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974101 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP97932212 EP98904537



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9837528Global Dossier 27.08.1998A1
Priority number Date
US80140797 20.02.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002512749Global Dossier 23.04.2002A
Priority number Date
US80140797 20.02.1997
US9800384 12.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002512739Global Dossier 23.04.2002A
Priority number Date
US9710657 19.06.1997
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0962003Global Dossier 26.08.2009B1
EP0962003 01.08.2007A4
EP0962003 08.12.1999A1
Priority number Date
US80140797 20.02.1997
US9800384 12.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0974101Global Dossier 27.06.2007B1
EP0974101 28.06.2000A4
EP0974101 26.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
US9710657 19.06.1997
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69737871D 09.08.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9710657 19.06.1997
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69737871T 28.02.2008T2
Priority number Date
US9710657 19.06.1997
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69841093D 08.10.2009D1
Priority number Date
US80140797 20.02.1997
US9800384 12.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5801643 01.09.1998A
Priority number Date
US80140797 20.02.1997
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2002087436 04.07.2002A1
Priority number Date
US31443099 18.05.1999
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9800945Global Dossier 12.02.1998A3
WO9800945 08.01.1998A2
Priority number Date
US66789696 20.06.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6058374 02.05.2000A
Priority number Date
US66789696 20.06.1996