blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0974101

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 SE 
Examination procedure08.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase11.01.1999National basic fee paid 
11.01.1999Search fee paid 
11.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted27.06.2007
Opposition procedure28.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.06.2008 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB SE
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990111
 
Event date:28.06.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE FR GB SE
 
Event date:28.06.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000517
 
Event date:05.07.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7G 06F 15/00 A, 7G 06K 17/00 B
 
Event date:27.06.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB SE
 
Event date:27.06.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:09.08.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69737871
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070809
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.10.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:19.10.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:04.06.2008 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20080328
 
Event date:25.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110428 AND 20110504
 
Event date:13.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION, US
Effective DATE:20120314
 
Event date:05.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69737871 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE
 
Event date:28.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69737871 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE
Effective DATE:20130205
 
Event date:28.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 69737871 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION (N.D.GES., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP., LOS ANGELES, US
Effective DATE:20130205
 
Event date:28.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 69737871 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION (N.D.GES., US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP., LOS ANGELES, CALIF., US
Effective DATE:20130205
 
Event date:28.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69737871 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE
Effective DATE:20130205
 
Event date:28.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69737871 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE
Effective DATE:20130205
 
Event date:19.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20150618
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20150618
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20150619
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20150619
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:03.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69737871 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160620
 
Event date:01.03.2017 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160619
 
Event date:31.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160630
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170103
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160619