Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974101

EP0974101 - RANDOM INTERVAL INVENTORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Los Angeles
CA 90067-2199 / US
[2007/26]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, California 90067-2199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GUTHRIE, Warren, E.
23W053 Hackberry
GlenEllyn, IL 60137 / US
02 / GORHAM, Kenneth, D.
443 W. Wilson, No. 301
Palatine, IL 60067 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97932212.019.06.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997US10657
Priority number, dateUS1996066789620.06.1996         Original published format: US 667896
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9800945
Date:08.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974101
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974101
Date:27.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/00, G06K17/00
[2000/27]
Former International [2000/04]G06F15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:ZUFALLSINTERVALL-INVENTARISIERUNGSSYSTEM[2000/04]
English:RANDOM INTERVAL INVENTORY SYSTEM[2000/04]
French:SYSTEME D'INVENTAIRE A INTERVALLES DE TEMPS ALEATOIRES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase11.01.1999National basic fee paid 
11.01.1999Search fee paid 
11.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
31.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2007Fee for grant paid
08.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9512858  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,3,7,16,17,20,22,37 * claims 17,40,56,77 *;
 [A]US4044351  (EVERSON EVAN PHILIP) [A] 1,3,7,16,22,30 * claims 1,11 *;
 [A]US4471345  (BARRETT JR RAYMOND L [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2043314  (ESSEX COUNTY COUNCIL) [A] 1,16,22 * claims 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0405074  (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 11,12,26,27 * claim 3 *
International search[X]US5426425  (CONRAD ALEXANDER [US], et al);
 [Y]US5394435  (WEERACKODY VIJITHA [US])