Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991844

EP0991844 - IMPROVED CLOSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook, Gregory H.
3826 N. Highway Drive
Tucson, AZ 85705 / US
For all designated states
Cook, Charles E.
2416 Sierra Lane
Plano, TX 75075 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date97932275.725.06.1997
[2000/15]
WO1997US11012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859144
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991844
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991844
Date:21.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/06
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM[2000/15]
English:IMPROVED CLOSURE SYSTEM[2000/15]
French:SYSTEME DE FERMETURE AMELIORE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase06.01.2000National basic fee paid 
06.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
02.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2002Fee for grant paid
07.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.08.2002
BE21.08.2002
CH21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
LI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
SE21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
ES28.02.2003
[2005/21]
Former [2005/01]AT21.08.2002
BE21.08.2002
CH21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
LI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
SE21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
ES28.02.2003
Former [2004/04]AT21.08.2002
BE21.08.2002
CH21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
LI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
ES28.02.2003
Former [2003/48]AT21.08.2002
BE21.08.2002
CH21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
LI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/46]AT21.08.2002
CH21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
LI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT21.08.2002
CH21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
LI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
Former [2003/09]NL21.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1303251  (GONTHIER) [A] 1,7 * figures 3-9 *;
 [A]FR2486583  (SOUCHIER GEORGES [FR])