EP0910832 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Washington University 1 Brookings Drive St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | For all designated states BROWN UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 42 Charlesfield Street Providence, RI 02912 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY 1 Brookings Drive St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | ||
For all designated states BROWN UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 42 Charlesfield Street Providence, RI 02912 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Michael, I. 41 Brighton Way Nr. 1 South St. Louis, MO 63105 / US | 02 /
Christensen, Gary, E. 10350 Gold Dust Drive St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | 03 /
Joshi, Sarang, C. 4346 Laclede St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | 04 /
Grenander, Ulf 26 Barberry Hill Providence, RI 02906 / US | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Leeming, John Gerard, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932453.0 | 08.07.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997US11563 | Priority number, date | US19960678628 | 10.07.1996 Original published format: US 678628 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801818 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910832 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910832 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/32, G06T7/00, G06F19/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
G06T3/153 (EP,US);
G06T7/33 (EP,US);
G06V10/24 (EP,US);
G06V10/754 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | G06K9/00, G06K9/32, G06K9/62, G06K9/74, G06K9/64, G06F19/00 | ||
Former IPC [1999/17] | G06K9/00, G06K9/32, G06K9/62, G06K9/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Extension states | AL | 01.02.1999 | LT | 01.02.1999 | LV | 01.02.1999 | RO | 01.02.1999 | SI | 01.02.1999 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM AUSRICHTEN VON BILDERN | [1999/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE REGISTRATION | [1999/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SUPERPOSITION D'IMAGES | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 01.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2004 | FI | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | IE | 08.07.2004 | LU | 08.07.2004 | DK | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.07.2004 | SE | 21.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | ES | 01.08.2004 | PT | 21.09.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 08.07.2004 | ||
LU | 08.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 08.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 21.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - JOSHI S C ET AL, "Hierarchical brain mapping via a generalized Dirichlet solution for mapping brain manifolds", VISION GEOMETRY IV, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 13-14 JULY 1995, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1995, USA, vol. 2573, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 278 - 289, XP000994978 [X] 1,4-8,10,13,15-19,21 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,9,11,12,14,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.216420 | [A] - BANERJEE A ET AL, "Accommodating anatomical variability in functional imaging via deformable templates", PROCEEDINGS. THIRTY-THIRD ANNUAL ALLERTON CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATION, CONTROL, AND COMPUTING, PROCEEDINGS OF 33RD ANNUAL ALLERTON CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATION, CONTROL, AND COMPUTING, MONTICELLO, IL, USA, 4-6 OCT. 1995, 1995, Urbana-Champaign, IL, USA, Univ. Illinois, USA, pages 275 - 284, XP000994981 [A] 1-21 * chapter 3 :; page 276 - page 279 * | International search | [Y]US4644582 (MORISHITA KOICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4987412 (VAITEKUNAS JEFFREY J [US], et al); | [Y]US5027422 (PEREGRIM THEODORE J [US], et al); | [Y]US5048103 (LECLERC VINCENT [FR], et al); | [Y]US5483606 (DENBER MICHEL J [US]); | [Y]US5490221 (RANSFORD GARY A [US], et al); | [Y]US5531520 (GRIMSON W ERIC L [US], et al); | [YP]US5568384 (ROBB RICHARD A [US], et al); | [YP]US5581638 (GIVENS FENTON L [US], et al); | [YP]US5633951 (MOSHFEGHI MEHRAN [NL]); | [Y] - PELIZZARI C A, ET AL., "ACCURATE THREE-DIMENSIONAL REGISTRATION OF CT, PET, AND/OR MR IMAGES OF THE BRAIN", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER ASSISTED TOMOGRAPHY, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19890101), vol. 13, no. 01, pages 20 - 26, XP002925932 | [Y] - GRAMKOW C, "REGISTRATION OF 2D AND 3D MEDICAL IMAGES", REPORT IMM-EKS, XX, XX, XX, (19960610), pages 01 - 327 + I/II, XP002981699 | [Y] - YALI AMIT, "Graphical Shape Templates for Deformable Model Registration passage", GRAPHICAL SHAPE TEMPLATES FOR DEFORMABLE MODEL REGISTRATION, XX, XX, XX, (19910101), pages 1 - 18, XP002981698 | [Y] - PENN R D, ET AL., "STEREOTACTIC SURGERY WITH IMAGE PROCESSING OF COMPUTERIZED TOMOGRAPHIC SCANS", NEUROSURGERY., WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, US, (19781001), vol. 03, no. 02, ISSN 0148-396X, pages 157 - 163, XP002945175 |