Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039883

EP1039883 - METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF APOLIPOPROTEIN E RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crutcher, Keith A.
1006 Lenox Place
Cincinnati, OH 54229 / US
For all designated states
Harmony, Judith A. K.
3950 Rose Hill
Cincinnati, OH 54229 / US
[2000/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Sexton, Jane Helen
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Sexton, Jane Helen
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97932533.908.07.1997
[2000/40]
WO1997US11836
Priority number, dateUS19960021405P09.07.1996         Original published format: US 21405 P
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9801101
Date:15.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1039883
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/00, A61K31/715, A61K38/55
[2001/39]
Former International [2000/40]A61K31/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG APOLIPOPROTEIN E BEDINGTER KRANKHEITEN[2000/40]
English:METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF APOLIPOPROTEIN E RELATED DISEASES[2000/40]
French:METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIEES A L'APOLIPOPROTEINE E[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1999National basic fee paid 
14.01.1999Search fee paid 
14.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/40]
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2006
31.08.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.09.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/17]
28.10.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/17]
Request for further processing for:07.02.2005Request for further processing filed
07.02.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.02.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200408   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2005
31.07.200509   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2006
31.07.200610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0293974  (CRINOS INDUSTRIA FARMACO [IT]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * claims 1-5 *;
 [X]US3895107  (MORRISON LESTER M) [X] 1-5,8-11 * claims 1-9 *;
 [X]EP0652009  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * claims 1-7 *;
 [X]WO9413319  (MILES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * claims 1-9 *