EP0912830 - DOUBLE ACTING PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN ROLLING DIAPHRAGM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 29982 Ivy Glenn Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2004/50] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states FURON COMPANY 29982 Ivy Glenn Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINGSFORD, Kenji, A. 668 Woodlawn Avenue Devore, CA 92407 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Anthony, Kai, Tai 1016 Vineyard Drive San Gabriel, CA 91775 / US | 03 /
HENDERSON, David, L. 28415 E. 5th Street Highland, CA 92346 / US | 04 /
TRAN, Van, Trong 828 Leyland Drive Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank, et al Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97932611.3 | 15.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997US12338 | Priority number, date | US19960683528 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: US 683528 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802659 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912830 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912830 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B17/00, F01B19/00 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
F04B53/164 (EP,US);
F04B43/0054 (EP);
F04B43/0063 (EP);
F04B43/026 (EP,US);
F04B43/0736 (EP,US);
F04B2201/0201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1999/18] | Title | German: | DOPPELWIRKENDE PNEUMATISCH ANGETRIEBENE ROLLMEMBRANPUMPE | [1999/18] | English: | DOUBLE ACTING PNEUMATICALLY DRIVEN ROLLING DIAPHRAGM PUMP | [1999/18] | French: | POMPE A PISTON A COMMANDE PNEUMATIQUE ET MEMBRANE A ENROULEMENT | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH0953566 ; | [A]EP0286404 (EATON SA MONACO [MC]) [A] 1,11,20,21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0625639 (ASTI S A E [FR]) [A] 1,11,20,21 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 34; figure 2 *; | [PA]EP0882921 (FURON CO [US]) [PA] 1,11,20,21* the whole document * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09053566 A 19970225 (KOGANEI CORP) [PA] 1,11,20,21 * abstract * | International search | [Y]SU191353 ; | [Y]US4773305 (NISSELS ROBERT [FR]); | [Y]US5062770 (STORY CARL E [US], et al) |