Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934061

EP0934061 - ISOBUTYLGABA AND ITS DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been limited
Status updated on  19.12.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2014(Expected) limited patent specificationpublished on 21.01.2015  [2015/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Company LLC
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2015/04]
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
Warner-Lambert Company LLC
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Lakhbir
23 Hinton View
Haddenham, Cambridgeshire CB6 5SP / GB
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Pfizer , et al
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2015/04]
Former [2004/49]Ruddock, Keith Stephen , et al
Pfizer Limited European Patents Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [1999/32]Mansmann, Ivo , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG, Mooswaldallee 1
79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date97932617.016.07.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997US12390
Priority number, dateUS19960022337P24.07.1996         Original published format: US 22337 P
[1999/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9803167
Date:29.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934061
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934061
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Type: B3 Limited patent 
No.:EP0934061
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/195
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
Extension statesAL14.12.1998
LT14.12.1998
LV14.12.1998
RO14.12.1998
SI14.12.1998
TitleGerman:ISOBUTYLGABA UND DESSEN DERIVATE ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG[2002/36]
English:ISOBUTYLGABA AND ITS DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN[1999/32]
French:ISOBUTYLGABA ET SES DERIVES UTILISES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR[1999/32]
Former [1999/32]ISOBUTYLGABA UND DESSEN DERIVATIVE ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG
Entry into regional phase14.12.1998National basic fee paid 
14.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/32]
13.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2003Fee for grant paid
24.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2004  09.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Orion Corporation ORION PHARMA
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
von Uexküll - Güldenband, Alexa, et al
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/18]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2004  09.03.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Orion Corporation ORION PHARMA
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
von Uexküll - Güldenband, Alexa, et al
Vossius & Partner Sieberstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2004/17]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2004   
Orion Corporation ORION PHARMA
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
von Uexküll Güldenband- Menzel, Alexa, et al
Vossius & Partner, Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
02.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.10.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.06.2005Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.06.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/45]
Limitations:23.09.2014Date of receipt of request for limitation
 admissible
21.11.2014Communication of intention to limit the patent
24.11.2014Fee for printing patent specification after limitation
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]  - G.A. MELLICK ET AL., "Gabapentin in the management of reflex Sympathetic Dystrophy.", J. PAIN SYMPTOM. MANAGEMENT, (1995), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 265 - 266, XP002043783 [X] 1,14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0885-3924(95)00001-F
 [PX]  - G.A. MELLICK ET AL., "Reflex sympathetic dystrophy treated with gabapentin.", ARCH. PHYS. MED. REHABIL., (1997), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 98 - 105, XP002043784 [PX] 1,14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-9993(97)90020-4
 [PX]  - M.J. FIELD ET AL., "Gabapentin and S-(+)-3-isobutylgaba represent a novel class of selective antihyperalgesic agents.", BR. .J. PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 121, no. 8, pages 1513 - 1522, XP002043785 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0701320
by applicantWO9209560
 WO9323383
    - KIM Y.C.; COCOLASE G.H., J. MED. CHEM., (1965), page 8509
    - COREY ET AL., TETRAHEDROM. LETT., (1975), pages 2647 - 2650