Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0916186

EP0916186 - Integrated circuit with resonant circuit using a capacitance adjustable by means of a programmable switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/20]PROGRAMMABLE SWITCH, ADJUSTABLE CAPACITANCE AND RESONANT CIRCUIT EFFECTED BY MEANS OF SUCH A SWITCH
[2000/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inside Technologies
Pépinière Axone
69930 Saint-Clément-les-Places / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
Inside technologies
Pépinière Axone
69930 Saint-Clément-les-Places / FR
Inventor(s)01 / KOWALSKI, Jacek
Av. Marius Joly, 50, Les Jardins des Seignières
F-13530 Trets / FR
02 / MARTIN, Michel
Chemin des Dunes, Quartier les Mauvares
F-13840 Rognes / FR
[1999/20]
Representative(s)Marchand, André
OMNIPAT
24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]Marchand, André
OMNIPAT, Centre ActimarT,1140, rue Ampère
13795 Aix-en-Provence Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date97932881.210.07.1997
[1999/20]
WO1997FR01258
Priority number, dateFR1996000991031.07.1996         Original published format: FR 9609910
[1999/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9805123
Date:05.02.1998
Language:FR
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0916186
Date:19.05.1999
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1999/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0916186
Date:13.12.2000
Language:FR
[2000/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/94, H03K17/687
[1999/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1999/20]
TitleGerman:Integrierte Schaltung mit einem eine durch einen programmierbaren Schalter einstellbare Kapazität aufweisenden Resonanzkreis[2000/16]
English:Integrated circuit with resonant circuit using a capacitance adjustable by means of a programmable switch[2000/16]
French:Circuit intégré avec circuit résonant comportant une capacité ajustable par commutateur programmable[2000/16]
Former [1999/20]PROGRAMMIERBARER SCHALTER, EINSTELLBARE KAPAZITÄT UND RESONANZKREIS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN SCHALTERS
Former [1999/20]PROGRAMMABLE SWITCH, ADJUSTABLE CAPACITANCE AND RESONANT CIRCUIT EFFECTED BY MEANS OF SUCH A SWITCH
Former [1999/20]COMMUTATEUR PROGRAMMABLE, CAPACITE AJUSTABLE ET CIRCUIT RESONANT REALISES AU MOYEN D'UN TEL COMMUTATEUR
Entry into regional phase21.12.1998National basic fee paid 
21.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/20]
17.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.06.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2000Fee for grant paid
30.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.12.2000
ES13.12.2000
IT13.12.2000
NL13.12.2000
BE31.07.2001
[2008/08]
Former [2003/06]AT13.12.2000
ES13.12.2000
NL13.12.2000
BE31.07.2001
Former [2002/27]AT13.12.2000
ES13.12.2000
Former [2001/37]AT13.12.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2851789  (LICENTIA GMBH) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * page 10, line 7 - page 11, line 10 * * page 13, line 14 - line 20 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [YA]EP0281142  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 10 * column 7, line 46 - line 52; figure 4 * [A] 9;
 [Y]JPH0442615  ;
 [Y]JPH0684384
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920526), vol. 016, no. 227, Database accession no. (E - 1207), [Y] 1,2,4-7,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940630), vol. 018, no. 349, Database accession no. (P - 1763), [Y] 8 * abstract *
Examination US4814640
  EP0615136