Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0948037

EP0948037 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SILICON EPITAXIAL WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/40]SILICON EPITAXIAL WAFER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME
[2006/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMCO CORPORATION
2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/31]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Sumitomo Mitsubishi Silicon Corporation
1-2-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8634 / JP
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIKAWA, Takashi
3638-1-1, Takatuhara Kashima-shi
Saga 849-13 / JP
02 / IKEDA, Naoki
806, 3-5-44, Kasei, Saga-shi
Saga-ken 849-0934 / JP
 [2002/18]
Former [1999/40]01 / FUJIKAWA, Takashi
3638-1-1, Takatuhara Kashima-shi
Saga 849-13 / JP
Representative(s)Lohr, Georg
Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Junkersstrasse 3
82178 Puchheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Lohr, Georg
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Junkersstrasse 3
82178 Puchheim / DE
Former [2004/04]Lohr, Georg, Dr.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Hauptstrasse 40
82223 Eichenau / DE
Former [2003/50]Popp, Eugen, Dr.
Dr. Münich & Kollegen c/o MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/40]Münich, Wilhelm, Dr. , et al
Kanzlei Münich, Steinmann, Schiller Wilhelm-Mayr-Str. 11
80689 München / DE
Application number, filing date97933020.625.07.1997
[1999/40]
WO1997JP02580
Priority number, dateJP1996021658329.07.1996         Original published format: JP 21658396
JP1997004970917.02.1997         Original published format: JP 4970997
[1999/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9805063
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0948037
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0948037
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/322
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesDE [1999/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER EPITAXIALSCHEIBE AUS SILIZIUM[2006/22]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SILICON EPITAXIAL WAFER[2006/22]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUETTE EPITAXIALE EN SILICIUM[2006/22]
Former [1999/40]EPITAXIALSCHEIBE AUS SILIZIUM UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG
Former [1999/40]SILICON EPITAXIAL WAFER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME
Former [1999/40]PLAQUETTE EPITAXIALE EN SILICIUM ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION
Entry into regional phase29.01.1999Translation filed 
17.02.1999National basic fee paid 
17.02.1999Search fee paid 
17.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
18.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
20.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2003Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2006
07.04.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.05.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2006Fee for grant paid
21.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200105   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2001
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS5994809  ;
 [Y]DE4108394  (KOMATSU DENSHI KINZOKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * example 1 *;
 [DY]JPS63198334  ;
 [Y]EP0137209  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 9, lines 20-30; page 10, lines 6-9; page 14, lines 14-31; page 20, lines 20-30; table I *;
 [Y]WO9310557  (KOMATSU DENSHI KINZOKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840922), vol. 008, no. 209, Database accession no. (E - 268), [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - WIJARANAKULA W ET AL, "EFFECT OF POSTANNEALING ON THE OXYGEN PRECIPITATION AND INTERNAL GETTERING PROCESS IN N/N+ (100) EPITAXIAL WAFERS", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, vol. 135, no. 12, ISSN 0013-4651, page 3113-3119, XP000134300 [Y] 1-5 * page 3114, left-hand column *
 [Y]  - BEAUCHAINE D ET AL, "EFFECT OF THIN FILM STRESS AND OXYGEN PRECIPITATION ON WARPAGE BEHAVIOR OF LARGE DIAMETER P/P+ EPITAXIAL WAFERS", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, vol. 136, no. 6, ISSN 0013-4651, page 1787-1793, XP000032170 [Y] 1-5 * section "Experimental Procedure", first paragraph" *
 [DY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881215), vol. 012, no. 481, Database accession no. (E - 694), [DY] 1-5 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PENSL G ET AL, "NEW OXYGEN DONORS IN SILICON", APPLIED PHYSICS A. SOLIDS AND SURFACES,DE,SPRINGER VERLAG. HEIDELBERG, vol. A48, no. 1, ISSN 0721-7250, page 49-57, XP000031133 [Y] 1-5 * pages 49-50 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00617763
 [Y]  - KUNG C Y, "EFFECT OF THERMAL HISTORY ON OXYGEN PRECIPITATES IN CZOCHRALSKI SILICON ANNEALED AT 1050 C", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 65, no. 12, ISSN 0021-8979, page 4654-4665, XP000069528 [Y] 1-5 * tables I,III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.343240
International search[X]JPS5994809
 [X]JPS63227026
 [Y]JPS6094722