Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0907697

EP0907697 - RAFFINATE HYDROCONVERSION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CODY, Ian, A.
3810 Jolly Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US
02 / BOATE, Douglas, R.
263 Shady Lake Parkway
Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US
03 / ALWARD, Sandra, J.
5202 Claycut Road
Baton Rouge, LA 70806 / US
04 / MURPHY, William, J.
16445 Coliseum Avenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US
05 / GALLAGHER, John, E.
46 Big Spring Road
Califon, NJ 07830 / US
06 / HARTING, Gary, L.
419 South Chestnut Street
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [1999/15]Somers, Harold Arnold , et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date97933161.823.06.1997
[1999/15]
WO1997US10969
Priority number, dateUS1996067838228.06.1996         Original published format: US 678382
[1999/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9800479
Date:08.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0907697
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998
[1999/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0907697
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Search report(s)International search reportUS08.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10G73/06, C10G73/32, C10G1/04, C10G11/02, C10G25/06, C10G65/04, C10G67/04
[2000/06]
Former International [1999/15]C10G73/06, C10G73/32, C10G1/04, C10G11/02, C10G25/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HYDROUMWANDLUNG VON RAFFINAT[1999/15]
English:RAFFINATE HYDROCONVERSION PROCESS[1999/15]
French:PROCEDE D'HYDROCONVERSION DE RAFFINAT[1999/15]
Entry into regional phase25.01.1999National basic fee paid 
25.01.1999Search fee paid 
25.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/15]
06.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2003Fee for grant paid
17.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US3779896  (WOODLE R);
 [Y]US4636299  (UNMUTH EUGENE E [US], et al)
Examination US4627908