blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995107 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995107



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 157
20.04.2005 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.07.2004 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
05.07.2004 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
22.03.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.09.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
04.09.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.01.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
22.08.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
24.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.01.1999 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 16
21.01.1999 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 17
21.01.1999 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 17
21.01.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.01.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 74