blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995107


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.07.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.08.2004  [2004/35]
16.03.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.09.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
19.02.2003 Surcharge for renewal fee
19.02.2003 Renewal fee
30.08.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
14.02.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
14.02.2002 Renewal fee
30.08.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
05.07.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
14.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2000 Renewal fee
12.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
21.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication