blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0995107

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure22.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/35]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Search fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200105   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2002
31.07.200206   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2003
31.07.200307   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991228
 
Event date:25.08.2004 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20040203